Seafarer | Nationality | Position | Signed on | Signed off | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Harbour | Date | Harbour | Date | |||
Norway | Unknown | 1/11/1965 | Unknown | 4/11/1965 | ||
Norway | Unknown | 9/7/1964 | Unknown | 1/11/1965 | ||
Norway | Unknown | 9/25/1963 | Unknown | 3/17/1964 | ||
Norway | Unknown | 3/5/1963 | Unknown | 4/19/1963 | ||
Norway | Unknown | 5/17/1961 | Unknown | 12/4/1961 | ||
Norway | ukjent | Unknown | 7/31/1956 | Unknown | 10/1/1956 | |
Norway | Tønsberg, Norge | 12/22/1960 | Walvis Bay, Namibia | 7/6/1962 | ||
Norway | Sandefjord, Norge | 10/18/1955 | Tønsberg, Norge | 9/26/1960 | ||
Norway | Tønsberg, Norge | 1/9/1961 | Rotterdam, Holland | 8/29/1962 | ||
Norway | Tønsberg, Norge | 9/27/1955 | Rotterdam, Holland | 8/1/1956 | ||
Norway | Tønsberg, Norge | 9/22/1955 | Napoli, Italia | 4/14/1957 | ||
Norway | Kaptein | Ommønstring | 6/6/1962 | London, UK | 3/1/1963 | |
Norway | Tønsberg, Norge | 10/12/1957 | Liverpool, Lancashire, UK | 3/13/1959 |