Seafarer | Nationality | Position | Signed on | Signed off | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Harbour | Date | Harbour 🠗1 | Date | |||
Norway | Sjømann | Norge for utlandet | Unknown | Omkom ved torpedering | 1/31/1940 | |
Norway | Unknown | Unknown | Omkom ved torpedering | 1/31/1940 | ||
Norway | Unknown | Unknown | Omkom ved torpedering | 1/31/1940 | ||
Norway | Kullemper | Unknown | Unknown | Omkom ved torpedering | 1/31/1941 | |
Norway | Unknown | Unknown | Omkom ved torpedering | 1/31/1940 | ||
Norway | Unknown | Unknown | Omkom ved torpedering | 1/31/1940 | ||
Norway | Maskinist | Unknown | Unknown | Omkom ved torpedering | 1/31/1940 | |
Norway | Unknown | Unknown | Omkom ved torpedering | 1/31/1940 | ||
Norway | 1. Maskinist (Maskinsjef) | Unknown | Unknown | Omkom ved torpedering | 1/31/1940 | |
Norway | Unknown | Unknown | Omkom ved torpedering | 1/31/1940 | ||
Norway | Oslo, Norge | 1/17/1940 | Omkom ved torpedering | 1/31/1940 | ||
Norway | Arendal, Norge | 1/2/1940 | Omkom ved torpedering | 1/31/1940 | ||
Norway | Harstad, Norge | 11/21/1939 | Omkom ved torpedering | 1/31/1940 | ||
Norway | Arendal, Norge | 1/2/1940 | Oslo, Norge | 1/17/1940 | ||
Norway | Fredrikstad, Norge | 8/1/1934 | Oslo, Norge | 1/7/1935 | ||
Norway | Unknown | 5/7/1935 | Port Talbot, Wales, UK | 4/20/1936 | ||
Norway | Port Talbot, Wales, UK | 4/20/1936 | Rouen, Frankrike | 9/29/1936 | ||
Norway | Skien, Norge | 8/4/1923 | South Shields, UK. | 8/11/1924 | ||
Norway | Oslo, Norge | 5/7/1935 | Unknown | Unknown |