Seafarer | Nationality | Position 🠗1 | Signed on | Signed off | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Harbour | Date | Harbour | Date | |||
Norway | Unknown | 5/22/1959 | Unknown | 8/16/1960 | ||
Norway | Kaptein | Oslo, Norge | 6/12/1968 | Oslo, Norge | 9/16/1968 | |
Norway | Arendal, Norge | 6/1/1971 | Larvik, Norge | 10/16/1971 | ||
Norway | Arendal, Norge | 6/1/1966 | Arendal, Norge | 10/19/1966 | ||
Norway | Kristiansand, Norge | 12/27/1963 | Kristiansand, Norge | 7/6/1964 | ||
Norway | Oslo, Norge | 8/26/1963 | Kristiansand, Norge | 1/3/1964 | ||
Norway | Oslo, Norge | 12/5/1962 | Oslo, Norge | 8/27/1963 | ||
Norway | Drammen, Norge | 9/5/1960 | Oslo, Norge | 5/18/1962 | ||
Norway | Tvedestrand, Norge | 4/24/1960 | Drammen, Norge | 9/8/1960 | ||
Norway | Rotterdam, Holland | 5/9/1959 | Kristiansand, Norge | 5/4/1960 | ||
Norway | Maskinsjef vikar | Unknown | 6/26/1964 | Unknown | 9/28/1964 | |
Norway | Fredrikstad, Norge | 10/20/1967 | Oslo, Norge | 7/8/1968 | ||
Norway | Fredrikstad, Norge | 8/30/1966 | Fredrikstad, Norge | 5/6/1967 | ||
Norway | Oslo, Norge | 10/16/1965 | Tønsberg, Norge | 7/11/1966 | ||
Norway | Oslo, Norge | 9/19/1961 | Kristiansand, Norge | 6/27/1962 | ||
Norway | Hurumlandet (Svelvik) Norge | 8/17/1960 | Hurumlandet (Svelvik) Norge | 6/9/1961 | ||
Norway | Oslo, Norge | 6/6/1959 | Drammen, Norge | 5/6/1960 |