Seafarer | Nationality | Position | Signed on | Signed off | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Harbour | Date 🠗1 | Harbour | Date | |||
Norway | Sjømann | Risør, Norge | 11/8/1879 | Philadelphia, PA, USA | 9/4/1880 | |
Norway | Sjømann | Risør, Norge | 11/8/1879 | New York, NY, USA | 1/13/1881 | |
Norway | Sjømann | Risør, Norge | 11/8/1879 | Rømt fra skipet. | Unknown | |
Norway | ukjent | Unknown | 11/8/1879 | Bilbao, Spania | 5/20/1880 | |
Norway | Risør, Norge | 9/24/1881 | Cardiff, Wales, UK | 12/8/1881 | ||
Norway | Sjømann | Risør, Norge | 9/24/1881 | Kristiansand, Norge | 10/19/1883 | |
Norway | ukjent | Unknown | 9/24/1881 | Unknown | 12/6/1881 | |
Norway | Sjømann | Risør, Norge | 9/24/1881 | Rømt fra skipet. | 12/6/1881 | |
Norway | 2. Styrmann / 1. Styrmann | Risør, Norge | 9/24/1881 | Le Havre, Frankrike | 1/3/1884 | |
Norway | Sjømann | Risør, Norge | 1/10/1884 | Rømt fra skipet. | 8/28/1884 | |
Norway | Sjømann | Risør, Norge | 1/15/1884 | Cardiff, Wales, UK | 3/28/1884 | |
Norway | Sjømann | Risør, Norge | 1/15/1884 | Risør, Norge | 11/3/1885 | |
Norway | Sjømann | Risør, Norge | 1/9/1886 | Hamburg, Tyskland | 8/14/1886 | |
Norway | Risør, Norge | 1/9/1886 | Liverpool, Lancashire, UK | 2/3/1887 | ||
Norway | Sjømann | Risør, Norge | 1/9/1886 | Unknown | Unknown | |
Norway | Sjømann | Risør, Norge | 1/9/1886 | Antwerpen, Belgia | 12/16/1887 | |
Norway | ukjent | Risør, Norge | 2/9/1886 | Antwerpen, Belgia | 5/29/1889 | |
Norway | Risør, Norge | 2/17/1887 | Risør, Norge | Unknown | ||
Norway | Risør, Norge | 11/7/1890 | Kristiania / Oslo, Norge | 1/11/1896 | ||
Norway | Risør, Norge | 2/12/1894 | Cape Town, Sør-Afrika | 5/10/1895 | ||
Norway | Sjømann | Risør, Norge | 2/17/1894 | Gool, Uruguay | 11/9/1894 | |
Norway | Sjømann | Risør, Norge | 2/17/1894 | Kristiania / Oslo, Norge | 1/11/1896 | |
Norway | Risør, Norge | 2/17/1894 | Gool, Uruguay | 11/29/1894 | ||
Norway | Lettmatros til Matros | Risør, Norge | 2/17/1894 | Risør, Norge | 1/11/1896 | |
Norway | Sjømann | Risør, Norge | 2/17/1894 | Kristiania / Oslo, Norge | 1/11/1896 |