Seafarer | Nationality | Position | Signed on | Signed off | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Harbour | Date | Harbour | Date | |||
Norway | ukjent | Lourenco Margues, Mozambique | 12/23/1940 | Unknown | 2/24/1941 | |
Norway | ukjent | Unknown | 12/4/1940 | Unknown | 2/24/1941 | |
Norway | Durban, Sør-Afrika | 12/2/1940 | Immingham, UK | 2/24/1941 | ||
Norway | ukjent | Om bord pr. | 7/1/1940 | Unknown | 3/7/1941 | |
Norway | Om bord pr. | 7/1/1940 | Torpedert | 6/24/1941 | ||
Norway | Alliert havn | 5/1/1940 | Durban, Sør-Afrika | 11/13/1940 | ||
Norway | Alliert havn | 4/9/1940 | Alliert havn | 11/30/1940 | ||
Norway | Om bord pr. | 4/9/1940 | Unknown | 8/11/1940 | ||
Norway | Kokk | Tønsberg, Norge | 1939 | Cape Town, Sør-Afrika | 8/30/1940 | |
Norway | Hull, Yorkshire, UK | 8/23/1939 | Grimsby, UK | 2/24/1941 | ||
Norway | Hull, Yorkshire, UK | 8/21/1939 | Grimsby, UK | 2/24/1941 | ||
Norway | Smører / Motormann | Oslo, Norge | 8/21/1939 | Torpedert | 6/24/1941 | |
Norway | Norge | 8/21/1939 | Unknown | 2/24/1941 | ||
Norway | Unknown | 8/21/1939 | Durban, Sør-Afrika | 11/15/1940 | ||
Norway | Styrmann / Skipsfører | Oslo, Norge | 8/20/1939 | Torpedert | 6/24/1941 | |
Norway | Unknown | 8/18/1939 | Unknown | 2/24/1941 | ||
Norway | Oslo f. utlandet | 8/18/1939 | Torpedert | 6/24/1941 | ||
Norway | Tønsberg, Norge | 8/18/1939 | Durban, Sør-Afrika | 11/15/1940 | ||
Norway | Tønsberg, Norge | 8/18/1939 | Blyth, Northumberland, UK | 3/7/1941 | ||
Norway | Tønsberg, Norge | 8/14/1939 | Torpedert | 6/24/1941 | ||
Norway | Tønsberg, Norge | 8/9/1939 | Torpedert | 6/24/1941 | ||
Norway | Unknown | 3/18/1939 | Durban, Sør-Afrika | 11/30/1940 | ||
Norway | Oslo, Norge | 8/4/1938 | Torpedert | 6/24/1941 | ||
Norway | 3. Maskinist / 2. Maskinist | Oslo, Norge | 7/22/1938 | Torpedert | 6/24/1941 | |
Norway | Unknown | 7/20/1938 | Unknown | 2/24/1941 |