Seafarer | Nationality | Position | Signed on | Signed off | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Harbour | Date | Harbour | Date | |||
Norway | Overstyrmann | Unknown | 3/17/1964 | Unknown | 1/25/1965 | |
Norway | Kaptein | Unknown | 6/1/1960 | Unknown | 10/29/1960 | |
Norway | Unknown | 7/1/1959 | Unknown | 4/3/1960 | ||
Norway | Unknown | 5/2/1959 | Unknown | 7/1/1959 | ||
Norway | Unknown | 11/28/1953 | Unknown | 12/6/1953 | ||
Norway | Kaptein | Unknown | 6/28/1952 | Unknown | 8/8/1953 | |
Norway | Pumpemann | Tønsberg, Norge | 5/6/1959 | Liverpool, Lancashire, UK | 12/3/1959 | |
Norway | Overstyrmann / Vikar | Oslo, Norge | 9/29/1955 | Unknown | 5/12/1956 | |
Norway | Oslo, Norge | 11/7/1952 | London, UK | 1/18/1953 | ||
Norway | Gøteborg, Sverige | Unknown | Unknown | 7/1952 |