Seafarer | Nationality | Position | Signed on | Signed off | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Harbour 🠗1 | Date | Harbour | Date | |||
Norway | Gdynia, Polen | 2/1/1973 | Årdalstangen | 8/11/1973 | ||
Norway | Ommønstring | 3/11/1956 | Unknown | 11/16/1956 | ||
Norway | Arbeidsleder | Unknown | 4/8/1980 | Unknown | 12/4/1980 | |
Norway | Unknown | 11/6/1975 | Unknown | 5/13/1976 | ||
Norway | Unknown | 2/7/1975 | Unknown | 8/19/1975 | ||
Norway | Unknown | 3/1/1974 | Unknown | 11/22/1974 | ||
Norway | Unknown | 2/1/1973 | Unknown | 11/23/1973 |