Seafarer | Nationality | Position | Signed on | Signed off | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Harbour | Date | Harbour | Date | |||
Norway | Marseille, Frankrike | 6/2/1964 | Marseille, Frankrike | 6/10/1964 | ||
Norway | Overstyrmann / Vikar | Unknown | Unknown | Unknown | Unknown | |
Norway | 1. Maskinist (Maskinsjef) | Utlandet | 10/24/1970 | Utlandet | 12/17/1971 | |
Norway | Ommønstring | 10/27/1966 | Malmø, Sverige | 10/19/1967 | ||
Norway | Melbourne, Victoria, Australia | 6/2/1966 | Ommønstring | 10/27/1966 | ||
Norway | Unknown | 7/10/1956 | Unknown | 5/3/1957 | ||
Norway | Toulon, Frankrike | 3/12/1956 | Hamburg, Tyskland | 3/2/1957 | ||
Norway | Kokk | Cardiff, Wales, UK | 10/22/1945 | Unknown | Unknown |