Seafarer | Nationality | Position | Signed on | Signed off | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Harbour | Date | Harbour | Date 🠗1 | |||
Norway | Lillesand, Norge | 9/1/1973 | Vigo, Spania | 12/19/1973 | ||
Norway | Lillesand, Norge | 3/1/1974 | Aarhus, Danmark | 6/18/1974 | ||
Norway | Risør, Norge | 6/20/1974 | København, Danmark | 9/20/1974 | ||
Norway | Risør, Norge | 8/26/1975 | Esbjerg, Danmark | 9/3/1975 | ||
Norway | Risør, Norge | 2/7/1976 | Stockholm, Sverige | 6/25/1976 | ||
Norway | Unknown | 6/1/1976 | Esbjerg, Danmark | 10/6/1976 | ||
Norway | Overstyrmann / Vikar | Arendal, Norge | 7/8/1978 | Amsterdam, Nederland | 9/4/1979 | |
Norway | Unknown | Unknown | Unknown | Unknown | ||
Norway | ukjent | Unknown | Unknown | Unknown | Unknown |