Seafarer | Nationality | Position 🠗1 | Signed on | Signed off | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Harbour | Date | Harbour | Date | |||
Norway | 1. Maskinist (Maskinsjef) | Svelvik, Norge | 5/29/1898 | Grimsby, UK | 2/14/1900 | |
Norway | Sjømann | Drammen, Norge | 5/9/1899 | Drammen, Norge | 6/3/1899 | |
Norway | Styrmann | Unknown | Unknown | Unknown | Unknown | |
Norway | ukjent | Sarpsborg, Norge | 5/8/1924 | Moss, Norge | 7/15/1924 |