Seafarer | Nationality | Position | Signed on | Signed off | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Harbour | Date 🠗1 | Harbour | Date | |||
Norway | Unknown | 6/25/1956 | Unknown | 7/24/1956 | ||
Norway | 2. Maskinist til 1. Maskinist (Maskinsjef) | Unknown | 4/22/1957 | Unknown | 5/25/1959 | |
Norway | Unknown | 4/8/1958 | Unknown | 9/8/1958 | ||
Norway | Gøteborg, Sverige | 4/27/1961 | Oslo, Norge | 5/16/1961 | ||
Norway | Unknown | 11/11/1964 | Unknown | 1/8/1965 |