Seafarer | Nationality | Position | Signed on | Signed off | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Harbour | Date | Harbour | Date | |||
Norway | Garantimaskinist | Unknown | 4/10/1966 | Unknown | 4/14/1966 | |
Norway | Unknown | 8/4/1951 | Haugesund, Norge | 6/4/1953 | ||
Norway | Liverpool, Lancashire, UK | 3/2/1953 | Liverpool, Lancashire, UK | 5/26/1953 | ||
Norway | 1. Maskinist (Maskinsjef) | Unknown | 11/18/1950 | Unknown | 3/10/1952 | |
Norway | Unknown | 3/3/1948 | Unknown | 8/26/1950 | ||
Norway | ukjent | Unknown | 11/23/1949 | Unknown | 5/6/1950 | |
Norway | Unknown | 10/9/1948 | Unknown | 5/31/1949 | ||
Norway | Unknown | 12/3/1937 | Unknown | 1/12/1938 |