Seafarer | Nationality | Position | Signed on | Signed off | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Harbour | Date | Harbour | Date | |||
Norway | Sjømann | Tvedestrand, Norge | 4/8/1863 | Ukjent | 11/3/1863 | |
Norway | Sjømann | Tvedestrand, Norge | 4/9/1866 | Tvedestrand, Norge | 9/8/1866 | |
Norway | Sjømann | Tvedestrand, Norge | 4/9/1866 | Tvedestrand, Norge | 9/29/1866 | |
Norway | 1.Styrmann til Skipsfører | Tvedestrand, Norge | 5/18/1865 | Tvedestrand, Norge | 11/6/1868 | |
Norway | Førstereisgutt | Tvedestrand, Norge | 2/29/1864 | Tvedestrand, Norge | 10/15/1865 | |
Norway | Sjømann | Tvedestrand, Norge | 3/7/1861 | Tvedestrand, Norge | 10/14/1861 | |
Norway | Førstereisgutt | Tvedestrand, Norge | 3/27/1860 | Tvedestrand, Norge | 10/14/1861 | |
Norway | Arendal, Norge | 5/13/1870 | Arendal, Norge | 12/24/1870 | ||
Norway | Risør, Norge | 3/31/1869 | Arendal, Norge | 11/8/1869 | ||
Norway | Sjømann | Risør, Norge | 3/31/1869 | Arendal, Norge | 9/7/1869 |