Seafarer | Nationality | Position | Signed on | Signed off | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Harbour | Date | Harbour 🠗1 | Date | |||
Norway | Overstyrmann / Vikar | Unknown | Unknown | Unknown | Unknown | |
Norway | ukjent | Unknown | 12/22/1995 | Unknown | 8/15/1962 | |
Norway | Smører / Motormann | Unknown | 11/2/1966 | Unknown | 11/15/1967 | |
Norway | Unknown | 10/28/1964 | Unknown | 1/7/1965 | ||
Norway | Unknown | 4/20/1964 | Unknown | 11/3/1964 | ||
Norway | 3. Maskinist / Assistent | Unknown | 1/28/1964 | Unknown | 10/28/1964 |