Seafarer | Nationality | Position | Signed on | Signed off | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Harbour 🠗1 | Date | Harbour | Date | |||
Norway | Sjømann | Lyngør, Norge | 5/2/1885 | London, UK | 8/11/1885 | |
Norway | Førstereisgutt | Lyngør, Norge | 5/2/1885 | Lyngør, Norge | 8/26/1885 | |
Norway | Sjømann | Lyngør, Norge | 4/19/1882 | Lyngør, Norge | 11/14/1882 | |
Norway | Førstereisgutt | Lyngør, Norge | 4/18/1882 | Lyngør, Norge | 11/14/1882 | |
Norway | Sjømann | Lyngør, Norge | 3/2/1881 | Lyngør, Norge | 5/11/1881 | |
Norway | Sjømann | Lyngør, Norge | 3/2/1881 | Lyngør, Norge | 11/17/1881 | |
Norway | Sjømann | Lyngør, Norge | 3/1/1881 | Risør, Norge | 11/17/1881 | |
Norway | Sjømann | Lyngør, Norge | 2/28/1881 | Lyngør, Norge | 11/17/1881 | |
Norway | Sjømann | Lyngør, Norge | 2/24/1881 | Lyngør, Norge | 11/17/1881 | |
Norway | Sjømann | Lyngør, Norge | 9/23/1880 | Tvedestrand, Norge | 11/10/1880 | |
Norway | Lyngør, Norge | 4/12/1880 | Tvedestrand, Norge | 9/7/1880 | ||
Norway | Lyngør, Norge | 4/12/1880 | Lyngør, Norge | 5/26/1885 | ||
Norway | Sjømann | Lyngør, Norge | 5/31/1877 | Lyngør, Norge | 12/10/1877 | |
Norway | Sjømann | Lyngør, Norge | 3/31/1875 | Lyngør, Norge | 12/22/1875 | |
Norway | Sjømann | Lyngør, Norge | 3/3/1875 | Lyngør, Norge | 12/23/1875 | |
Norway | Lyngør, Norge | 3/8/1869 | Lyngør, Norge | 12/27/1871 | ||
Norway | Sjømann | Lyngør, Norge | 3/14/1866 | Unknown | Unknown | |
Norway | Risør, Norge | 4/20/1870 | Risør, Norge | 12/19/1870 | ||
Norway | Risør, Norge | 3/20/1867 | Risør, Norge | 5/25/1868 | ||
Norway | Sjømann | Risør, Norge | 3/20/1867 | Lyngør, Norge | 10/20/1870 | |
Norway | Sjømann | Risør, Norge | 12/6/1864 | Risør, Norge | 1/18/1865 | |
Norway | Risør, Norge | 3/22/1864 | Lyngør, Norge | 12/6/1864 | ||
Norway | Sjømann | Risør, Norge | 3/22/1864 | Lyngør, Norge | 12/6/1864 | |
Norway | Sjømann | Risør, Norge | 6/11/1863 | Risør, Norge | 11/5/1863 | |
Norway | 2. Styrmann / 1. Styrmann | Risør, Norge | 3/13/1862 | Risør, Norge | 6/11/1873 |