Seafarer | Nationality | Position | Signed on | Signed off | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Harbour | Date | Harbour | Date 🠗1 | |||
Norway | Unknown | 10/13/1948 | Unknown | 6/20/1949 | ||
Norway | Helsingborg, Sverige | 10/16/1948 | Unknown | 8/31/1949 | ||
Norway | Unknown | 9/1/1949 | Hamburg, Tyskland | 2/20/1950 | ||
Norway | Unknown | 3/4/1950 | London, UK | 5/5/1950 | ||
Norway | Unknown | 1/19/1950 | Unknown | 5/5/1950 | ||
Norway | Unknown | 6/14/1950 | Unknown | 11/28/1950 | ||
Norway | Unknown | 5/22/1951 | Unknown | 8/1/1951 | ||
Norway | Kaptein | Unknown | 11/5/1952 | Unknown | 1/28/1953 | |
Norway | Arendal f. utlandet | 4/6/1956 | London, UK | 9/28/1956 | ||
Norway | Unknown | 6/29/1964 | Unknown | 12/8/1964 | ||
Norway | Molde, Norge | 6/29/1967 | London, UK | 9/4/1967 |