Seafarer | Nationality | Position | Signed on | Signed off | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Harbour | Date 🠗1 | Harbour | Date | |||
Norway | Kaptein | Stord, Norge | 6/1/1970 | Stord, Norge | 12/11/1970 | |
Norway | Stord, Norge | 7/14/1970 | Finnart, Scotland | 11/17/1971 | ||
Norway | ukjent | Unknown | 9/11/1970 | Unknown | 7/6/1971 | |
Norway | ukjent | Unknown | 9/1/1971 | Unknown | 11/17/1971 | |
Norway | London, UK | 1/6/1972 | Stord, Norge | 7/15/1972 | ||
Norway | Arbeidsleder | Unknown | 8/15/1973 | Unknown | 9/25/1973 | |
Norway | ukjent | Unknown | 9/1/1974 | Unknown | 11/12/1974 |