Seafarer | Nationality | Position 🠗1 | Signed on | Signed off | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Harbour | Date | Harbour | Date | |||
Norway | 1. Maskinist (Maskinsjef) | Unknown | 7/10/1949 | Unknown | 10/30/1950 | |
Norway | 2. Styrmann / 1. Styrmann | Unknown | 2/2/1948 | Unknown | 5/19/1951 | |
Norway | Unknown | 3/3/1951 | Unknown | 6/13/1951 | ||
Norway | Saigon, Vietnam | 10/22/1951 | Singapore | 4/12/1952 | ||
Norway | Sydney, NSW, Australia | 1/11/1952 | Singapore | 4/12/1952 | ||
Norway | Unknown | 7/9/1951 | Unknown | 11/20/1951 | ||
Norway | ukjent | Unknown | 10/6/1950 | Unknown | 1/5/1951 | |
Norway | ukjent | Unknown | 5/17/1949 | Unknown | 10/11/1949 | |
Norway | ukjent | Unknown | 5/7/1948 | Unknown | 10/27/1948 | |
Norway | ukjent | Unknown | 2/25/1948 | Unknown | Unknown |