Seafarer | Nationality | Position | Signed on | Signed off | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Harbour | Date 🠗1 | Harbour | Date | |||
Norway | Oslo, Norge | 11/3/1947 | Sarpsborg, Norge | 6/18/1948 | ||
Norway | Ommønstring | 6/18/1948 | Unknown | Unknown | ||
Norway | Oslo, Norge | 6/14/1950 | Oslo, Norge | 9/15/1950 | ||
Norway | Unknown | 2/16/1951 | Unknown | Unknown | ||
Norway | Trondheim, Norge | 4/6/1951 | Oslo, Norge | 4/12/1951 | ||
Norway | Unknown | 9/14/1951 | Unknown | 10/10/1951 | ||
Norway | Unknown | 1951 | Bordeaux, Frankrike | 2/23/1952 | ||
Norway | Tønsberg, Norge | 3/8/1952 | Sarpsborg, Norge | 3/13/1952 | ||
Norway | Ommønstring | 3/13/1952 | Sarpsborg, Norge | 4/7/1952 | ||
Norway | Ommønstring | 4/7/1952 | Unknown | 5/18/1952 | ||
Norway | Unknown | 5/26/1953 | Unknown | 6/7/1955 | ||
Norway | 1. Maskinist (Maskinsjef) | Unknown | 6/16/1953 | Unknown | 8/4/1953 | |
Norway | Oslo, Norge | 9/30/1954 | Oslo, Norge | 2/16/1955 | ||
Norway | Unknown | 4/1/1955 | Unknown | 4/22/1955 | ||
Norway | ukjent | Unknown | 6/25/1955 | Unknown | 8/30/1955 | |
Norway | Oslo, Norge | 6/28/1955 | Oslo, Norge | 10/9/1957 | ||
Norway | Unknown | 8/29/1955 | Ommønstring | 2/1/1956 | ||
Norway | Ommønstring | 2/1/1956 | Unknown | 3/19/1956 | ||
Norway | Oslo, Norge | 3/18/1956 | Tvedestrand, Norge | 9/18/1957 | ||
Norway | Unknown | 9/15/1956 | Unknown | 6/18/1957 | ||
Norway | Unknown | 10/8/1956 | Unknown | 7/17/1957 | ||
Norway | Unknown | 6/19/1957 | Unknown | 9/18/1957 | ||
Norway | Unknown | 9/18/1957 | Unknown | 12/17/1957 | ||
Norway | Unknown | 10/8/1957 | Unknown | 12/17/1957 |