Seafarer | Nationality | Position | Signed on | Signed off | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Harbour | Date | Harbour | Date | |||
Norway | ukjent | Unknown | 4/17/1944 | Unknown | 5/5/1944 | |
Norway | Unknown | 1/15/1944 | Unknown | 5/5/1944 | ||
Norway | ukjent | Unknown | 7/16/1943 | Fleetwood, UK | 6/5/1944 | |
Norway | ukjent | Unknown | 4/20/1943 | Unknown | 7/9/1943 | |
Norway | ukjent | Unknown | 9/15/1942 | Unknown | 9/30/1942 | |
Norway | ukjent | Unknown | 9/6/1942 | Unknown | 9/11/1942 | |
Norway | Unknown | 9/2/1942 | Unknown | 1/10/1943 | ||
Norway | Reykjavik, Island | 4/17/1944 | Fleetwood, UK | 5/8/1944 | ||
Norway | Reykjavik, Island | 4/7/1944 | Fleetwood, UK | 5/8/1944 | ||
Norway | Reykjavik, Island | 1/18/1944 | Reykjavik, Island | 2/29/1944 | ||
Norway | 1. Maskinist (Maskinsjef) | Reykjavik, Island | 7/14/1943 | Fleetwood, UK | 5/8/1944 | |
Norway | Reykjavik, Island | 7/1/1943 | Reykjavik, Island | 4/15/1944 | ||
Norway | Stuert / Matros | Reykjavik, Island | 4/20/1943 | Reykjavik, Island | 4/15/1944 | |
Denmark | Reykjavik, Island | 3/1943 | Reykjavik, Island | 5/31/1943 | ||
Norway | Reykjavik, Island | 2/15/1943 | Fleetwood, UK | 5/8/1944 | ||
Norway | Reykjavik, Island | 1/14/1943 | Reykjavik, Island | 1/17/1944 | ||
Norway | Reykjavik, Island | 10/2/1942 | Liverpool, Lancashire, UK | 5/12/1944 | ||
Norway | Maskinist | Reykjavik, Island | 10/1/1942 | Reykjavik, Island | 7/15/1943 | |
Norway | Reykjavik, Island | 9/21/1942 | Fleetwood, UK | 5/6/1944 | ||
Norway | Reykjavik, Island | 9/15/1942 | Reykjavik, Island | 4/15/1943 | ||
Norway | Reykjavik, Island | 9/4/1942 | Fleetwood, UK | 5/5/1944 | ||
Norway | ukjent | Reykjavik, Island | 9/2/1942 | Reykjavik, Island | 9/29/1942 | |
Norway | Reykjavik, Island | 9/2/1942 | Fleetwood, UK | 3/5/1944 | ||
Norway | ukjent | Reykjavik, Island | 9/2/1942 | Reykjavik, Island | 4/15/1944 | |
Norway | ukjent | Reykjavik, Island | 9/2/1942 | Reykjavik, Island | 3/8/1943 |