Seafarer | Nationality | Position | Signed on | Signed off | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Harbour | Date | Harbour 🠗1 | Date | |||
Great Britain | Sjømann av ukjent grad | Unknown | Unknown | Alger, Algerie | 12/2/1943 | |
Spain | Trimmer | Unknown | Unknown | Alger, Algerie | 2/15/1944 | |
Romania | Alger, Algerie | 12/7/1943 | Alger, Algerie | 2/15/1944 | ||
Spain | Kullemper / Fyrbøter | Alger, Algerie | 12/2/1943 | Alger, Algerie | 2/15/1944 | |
Spain | Sfax, Tunisia | 7/25/1943 | Alger, Algerie | 2/12/1944 | ||
Spain | Unknown | 7/25/1943 | Alger, Algerie | 2/15/1944 | ||
Norway | London, UK | 5/11/1943 | Alger, Algerie | 12/1/1943 | ||
Norway | River Tyne, UK | 2/9/1943 | Alger, Algerie | 9/30/1943 | ||
Norway | London, UK | 2/3/1943 | Alger, Algerie | 12/4/1943 | ||
Norway | London, UK | 1/20/1943 | Alger, Algerie | 12/4/1943 | ||
Norway | London, UK | 12/22/1942 | Alger, Algerie | 12/9/1943 | ||
Norway | Lettmatros / Matros | London, UK | 6/16/1942 | Alger, Algerie | 12/3/1943 | |
Great Britain | Skytter | Alliert havn | Unknown | Alliert havn | Unknown | |
Norway | Matros / Skytter | Alliert havn | 2/17/1944 | Alliert havn | 4/13/1944 | |
Norway | Alliert havn | 1/12/1942 | Alliert havn | 7/4/1942 | ||
Norway | Kokk | Alliert havn | 7/21/1941 | Alliert havn | 12/3/1941 | |
Norway | Alliert havn | 4/2/1941 | Alliert havn | 7/15/1941 | ||
Norway | Alliert havn | 3/28/1941 | Alliert havn | 7/17/1941 | ||
Norway | Matros / Skytter | Alliert havn | 3/20/1941 | Alliert havn | 10/1/1941 | |
Norway | Alliert havn | 3/18/1941 | Alliert havn | 7/17/1941 | ||
Norway | ukjent | Alliert havn | 12/24/1940 | Alliert havn | 3/17/1941 | |
Norway | Om bord pr. | 6/1/1940 | Alliert havn | 3/22/1941 | ||
Norway | Arendal, Norge | 11/4/1938 | Arendal, Norge | 2/6/1939 | ||
Norway | Sandefjord, Norge | 6/2/1936 | Arendal, Norge | 6/24/1938 | ||
Norway | Rotterdam, Holland | 12/9/1932 | Arendal, Norge | 3/9/1933 |