Seafarer | Nationality | Position | Signed on | Signed off | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Harbour 🠗1 | Date | Harbour | Date | |||
Sweden | ukjent | Algeciras, Spain | 12/9/1943 | Greenock, UK | 3/18/1944 | |
Norway | Trimmer | Alger, Algerie | 2/17/1944 | Liverpool, Lancashire, UK | 2/10/1945 | |
Great Britain | Trimmer | Alger, Algerie | 2/17/1944 | Greenock, UK | 3/31/1944 | |
Dominican Republic | Alger, Algerie | 2/16/1944 | Greenock, UK | 3/15/1944 | ||
Norway | ukjent | Alger, Algerie | 2/15/1944 | Gourock, UK | 3/18/1944 | |
Sweden | Alger, Algerie | 2/15/1944 | Greenock, UK | 3/18/1944 | ||
Norway | Alger, Algerie | 2/14/1944 | Greenock, UK | 4/3/1944 | ||
Romania | Alger, Algerie | 12/7/1943 | Alger, Algerie | 2/15/1944 | ||
Spain | Kullemper / Fyrbøter | Alger, Algerie | 12/2/1943 | Alger, Algerie | 2/15/1944 | |
Norway | Alger, Algerie | 9/28/1943 | Cardiff, Wales, UK | 5/3/1944 | ||
Denmark | Alger, Algerie | 9/27/1943 | Workington, UK | 3/8/1944 | ||
Great Britain | Skytter | Alliert havn | Unknown | Alliert havn | Unknown | |
Norway | Matros / Skytter | Alliert havn | 2/17/1944 | Alliert havn | 4/13/1944 | |
Norway | Alliert havn | 1/12/1942 | Alliert havn | 7/4/1942 | ||
Norway | Kokk | Alliert havn | 12/2/1941 | Hartlepool, UK. | 1/30/1942 | |
Norway | Kokk | Alliert havn | 7/21/1941 | Alliert havn | 12/3/1941 | |
Norway | Alliert havn | 4/2/1941 | Alliert havn | 7/15/1941 | ||
Norway | Alliert havn | 3/28/1941 | Alliert havn | 7/17/1941 | ||
Norway | Matros / Skytter | Alliert havn | 3/20/1941 | Alliert havn | 10/1/1941 | |
Norway | Alliert havn | 3/18/1941 | Alliert havn | 7/17/1941 | ||
Norway | ukjent | Alliert havn | 12/24/1940 | Alliert havn | 3/17/1941 | |
Norway | ukjent | Arendal, Norge | 10/31/1939 | Unknown | 11/27/1939 | |
Norway | Arendal, Norge | 10/31/1939 | Halden, Norge | 11/27/1939 | ||
Norway | ukjent | Arendal, Norge | 10/31/1939 | Unknown | Unknown | |
Norway | Arendal, Norge | 5/13/1939 | Odda, Norge | 10/31/1939 |