Seafarer | Nationality | Position | Signed on | Signed off | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Harbour | Date | Harbour | Date | |||
Norway | Overstyrmann / Vikar | Kristiansand, Norge | 1/8/1981 | Pajaritos port, Mexico | 6/12/1981 | |
Norway | Overstyrmann / Vikar | Kristiansand, Norge | 6/20/1980 | Lavera, Frankrike | 11/5/1980 | |
Norway | 1. Styrmann / Overstyrmann | Kristiansand, Norge | 8/1/1979 | Tarragona, Spania | 3/17/1980 | |
Norway | Overstyrmann / Vikar | Kristiansand, Norge | 9/1/1978 | Pajaritos port, Mexico | 4/24/1979 | |
Norway | Overstyrmann / Vikar | Kristiansand, Norge | 12/16/1977 | Marseille, Frankrike | 6/11/1978 | |
Norway | Kristiansand, Norge | 4/1/1977 | Lavera, Frankrike | 10/14/1977 | ||
Norway | Unknown | 6/27/1977 | Unknown | 7/31/1977 |