Seafarer | Nationality | Position | Signed on | Signed off | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Harbour | Date | Harbour | Date | |||
Canada | Ukjent | Unknown | Unknown | Unknown | Unknown | |
Great Britain | Gunnery Officer | Newcastle, UK | 6/24/1941 | Unknown | Unknown | |
Norway | Jungmann til Lettmatros | Mandal, Norge | 12/5/1939 | Newcastle, UK | 5/5/1941 | |
Norway | Unknown | 1/4/1941 | Unknown | 3/12/1941 | ||
Skytter | Unknown | 4/21/1941 | Om bord pr. | 6/1/1941 | ||
Norway | London, UK | 7/4/1941 | London, UK | 9/24/1941 | ||
Norway | Unknown | 9/29/1941 | Unknown | Unknown | ||
Norway | Matros / Skytter | Unknown | 12/17/1941 | Gourock, UK | 3/24/1942 | |
Norway | Glasgow, UK | 5/27/1942 | Torpedert | 11/19/1942 | ||
Norway | Glasgow, UK | 5/22/1942 | Torpedert | 11/19/1942 | ||
Norway | Newcastle, UK | 11/5/1940 | Swansea, UK | 1/28/1941 | ||
Norway | Oslo, Norge | 3/12/1940 | London, UK | 7/5/1941 | ||
Norway | Lillesand f. utlandet | 9/14/1933 | Porsgrunn, Norge | 12/9/1933 | ||
Norway | Porsgrunn, Norge | 4/14/1939 | Torpedert | 11/19/1942 | ||
Norway | West Hartlepool, UK | 8/3/1923 | Drammen, Norge | 8/30/1923 | ||
Norway | Newcastle, UK | 7/28/1941 | Methil, Fife, Skottland, UK | 10/13/1941 | ||
Norway | Cardiff, Wales, UK | 1/4/1941 | Newcastle, UK | 3/12/1941 |