Seafarer | Nationality | Position | Signed on | Signed off | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Harbour | Date | Harbour | Date | |||
Norway | Sjømann | Porsgrunn, Norge | 4/2/1918 | Unknown | Unknown | |
Norway | Plymouth, Devon, UK | 1/9/1941 | Newcastle, UK | 2/18/1942 | ||
Norway | Oslo, Norge | 3/12/1940 | London, UK | 7/5/1941 | ||
Norway | Oslo, Norge | 3/7/1939 | Torpedert | 11/19/1942 | ||
Norway | Ommønstring | 11/1/1939 | Torpedert | 11/19/1942 | ||
Norway | Om bord pr. | 7/1/1940 | Unknown | 10/30/1940 | ||
Ireland | ukjent | Newcastle, UK | 6/25/1942 | Unknown | Unknown | |
Norway | Newcastle, UK | 4/7/1942 | Torpedert | 11/19/1942 | ||
Norway | Kokk | Newcastle, UK | 2/7/1942 | Cardiff, Wales, UK | 9/30/1942 | |
Norway | Newcastle, UK | 2/4/1942 | Torpedert | 11/19/1942 | ||
Norway | Matros / Skytter | Newcastle, UK | 12/17/1941 | Torpedert | 11/19/1942 | |
Great Britain | Kokk | Newcastle, UK | 12/15/1941 | Cardiff, Wales, UK | 3/12/1942 | |
Great Britain | Newcastle, UK | 12/9/1941 | Gourock, UK | 3/27/1942 | ||
Norway | Newcastle, UK | 11/19/1941 | Cardiff, Wales, UK | 3/12/1942 | ||
Norway | Newcastle, UK | 7/28/1941 | Methil, Fife, Skottland, UK | 10/13/1941 | ||
Norway | Newcastle, UK | 7/28/1941 | Newcastle, UK | 11/19/1941 | ||
Norway | Newcastle, UK | 7/28/1941 | Newcastle, UK | 11/19/1941 | ||
Norway | Newcastle, UK | 6/28/1941 | Newcastle, UK | 12/22/1941 | ||
Great Britain | Gunnery Officer | Newcastle, UK | 6/24/1941 | Unknown | Unknown | |
Norway | Newcastle, UK | 6/24/1941 | Newcastle, UK | 8/12/1941 | ||
Norway | Newcastle, UK | 5/3/1941 | Newcastle, UK | 7/28/1941 | ||
Norway | Newcastle, UK | 4/15/1941 | London, UK | 7/4/1941 | ||
Great Britain | Newcastle, UK | 1/29/1941 | Cardiff, Wales, UK | 3/12/1942 | ||
Norway | Newcastle, UK | 11/5/1940 | Swansea, UK | 1/28/1941 | ||
Norway | ukjent | Newcastle, UK | 10/12/1940 | Newcastle, UK | 5/5/1941 |