Seafarer | Nationality | Position | Signed on | Signed off | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Harbour | Date | Harbour | Date | |||
Norway | ukjent | Unknown | 6/24/1940 | Unknown | 10/21/1940 | |
Norway | ukjent | Unknown | 3/4/1940 | Unknown | 6/22/1940 | |
Norway | New York, NY, USA | 10/20/1939 | Unknown | 12/6/1939 | ||
Norway | Unknown | 8/9/1938 | Unknown | 9/8/1939 | ||
Norway | 1. Maskinist (Maskinsjef) | Rotterdam, Holland | 8/1/1938 | Unknown | 9/5/1939 | |
Norway | Unknown | 4/3/1934 | Unknown | 12/6/1934 | ||
Norway | Sjømann | Porsgrunn, Norge | 4/2/1918 | Unknown | Unknown | |
Ireland | Unknown | Unknown | Torpedert | 11/19/1942 | ||
Norway | London, UK | 11/3/1942 | Torpedert | 11/19/1942 | ||
Great Britain | Cardiff, Wales, UK | 10/16/1942 | Torpedert | 11/19/1942 | ||
Norway | Cardiff, Wales, UK | 10/16/1942 | Torpedert | 11/19/1942 | ||
Norway | Kokk | Cardiff, Wales, UK | 10/2/1942 | Torpedert | 11/19/1942 | |
Great Britain | London, UK | 8/24/1942 | Torpedert | 11/19/1942 | ||
Norway | Glasgow, UK | 7/30/1942 | Torpedert | 11/19/1942 | ||
Norway | Matros / Skytter | Grangemouth, UK | 5/29/1942 | Torpedert | 11/19/1942 | |
Norway | Glasgow, UK | 5/27/1942 | Torpedert | 11/19/1942 | ||
Norway | Glasgow, UK | 5/22/1942 | Torpedert | 11/19/1942 | ||
Norway | Newcastle, UK | 4/7/1942 | Torpedert | 11/19/1942 | ||
Norway | Newcastle, UK | 2/4/1942 | Torpedert | 11/19/1942 | ||
Norway | Matros / Skytter | Newcastle, UK | 12/17/1941 | Torpedert | 11/19/1942 | |
Norway | London, UK | 12/15/1941 | Torpedert | 11/19/1942 | ||
Norway | Ommønstring | 11/1/1939 | Torpedert | 11/19/1942 | ||
Norway | Unknown | 9/6/1939 | Torpedert | 11/19/1942 | ||
Norway | Porsgrunn, Norge | 4/14/1939 | Torpedert | 11/19/1942 | ||
Norway | Oslo, Norge | 3/7/1939 | Torpedert | 11/19/1942 |