Seafarer | Nationality | Position | Signed on | Signed off | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Harbour 🠗1 | Date | Harbour | Date | |||
Norway | London, UK | 9/18/1940 | Glasgow, UK | 1/20/1941 | ||
Norway | London, UK | 9/18/1940 | Glasgow, UK | 1/6/1941 | ||
Norway | London, UK | 9/18/1940 | Glasgow, UK | 1/2/1941 | ||
Norway | London, UK | 9/18/1940 | Glasgow, UK | 1/2/1941 | ||
Norway | London, UK | 9/10/1940 | Glasgow, UK | 1/2/1941 | ||
Norway | Matros / Telegrafist | Om bord pr. | 1939 | Om bord pr. | 1940 | |
Norway | Om bord pr. | 1939 | Om bord pr. | 1940 | ||
Norway | Om bord pr. | 1939 | Om bord pr. | 1940 | ||
Norway | Om bord pr. | 1939 | Om bord pr. | 1940 | ||
Norway | Byssegutt / Lugargutt - Hvalfangst | Om bord pr. | 1939 | Om bord pr. | 1940 | |
Norway | Om bord pr. | 1939 | Om bord pr. | 1940 | ||
Norway | Styrmann | Om bord pr. | 1939 | Om bord pr. | 1940 | |
Norway | Sandefjord, Norge | 10/7/1939 | New York, NY, USA | 12/18/1940 | ||
Norway | Maskinassistent | Sandefjord, Norge | 10/7/1939 | Om bord pr. | 1940 | |
Norway | Sandefjord, Norge | 10/7/1939 | New York, NY, USA | 7/8/1940 | ||
Norway | Tønsberg, Norge | 5/9/1950 | Tønsberg, Norge | 11/16/1950 | ||
Norway | Tønsberg, Norge | 4/30/1949 | Tønsberg, Norge | 11/29/1949 | ||
Norway | ukjent | Walvis Bay, Namibia | 9/20/1940 | Glasgow, UK | 1/2/1941 | |
Norway | Sjef (Marinen) | Unknown | Unknown | Unknown | Unknown | |
Norway | Unknown | 9/18/1940 | Glasgow, UK | 1/7/1941 | ||
Norway | ukjent | Unknown | 9/17/1940 | Unknown | 2/28/1941 | |
Norway | Skytter / Skipsfører | Unknown | 10/7/1939 | Unknown | 9/1/1940 | |
Norway | Unknown | 10/7/1939 | Unknown | 10/16/1940 | ||
Norway | Unknown | 10/7/1939 | Unknown | 9/26/1940 |