Seafarer | Nationality | Position | Signed on | Signed off | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Harbour | Date | Harbour | Date | |||
Norway | ukjent | Unknown | 4/17/1947 | Unknown | Unknown | |
Norway | ukjent | Unknown | 4/17/1947 | Unknown | Unknown | |
Norway | ukjent | Unknown | 4/17/1947 | Unknown | Unknown | |
Norway | Offiser | Unknown | 10/11/1954 | Unknown | 10/20/1955 | |
Norway | Signalgast | Unknown | 1/15/1954 | Unknown | 6/30/1955 | |
Norway | Sjef (Marinen) | Unknown | 2/19/1949 | Unknown | 12/8/1950 | |
Norway | Kvm. II kl. | Unknown | 6/4/1947 | Unknown | 10/13/1949 | |
Norway | ukjent | Unknown | 1/21/1947 | Unknown | 5/28/1947 |