Seafarer | Nationality | Position | Signed on | Signed off | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Harbour | Date | Harbour 🠗1 | Date | |||
Norway | Unknown | 8/21/1953 | Unknown | 1/20/1954 | ||
Norway | Unknown | 6/16/1952 | Unknown | 10/4/1952 | ||
Norway | Unknown | 8/22/1950 | Unknown | 4/17/1951 | ||
Norway | Unknown | 6/11/1949 | Unknown | 7/23/1949 | ||
Norway | 1. Maskinist (Maskinsjef) | Unknown | 4/1/1949 | Unknown | 2/3/1950 |