Seafarer | Nationality | Position | Signed on | Signed off | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Harbour | Date | Harbour | Date | |||
Norway | Ommønstring | 3/1/1936 | Ommønstring | 1/31/1939 | ||
Norway | Unknown | 2/27/1950 | Unknown | Unknown | ||
Norway | Unknown | 1/22/1947 | Unknown | 3/4/1950 | ||
Norway | New York, NY, USA | 10/17/1944 | Alger, Algerie | 3/31/1947 | ||
Norway | Bombay, India | 10/4/1943 | Abadan, Iran | 12/3/1943 | ||
Norway | Bombay, India | 2/20/1943 | Bombay, India | 10/4/1943 | ||
Norway | Ommønstring | 1/1/1942 | Durban, Sør-Afrika | 4/17/1942 | ||
Norway | Oslo, Norge | 5/20/1932 | Arendal, Norge | 10/25/1932 | ||
Great Britain | Philadelphia, PA, USA | 10/18/1945 | Unknown | Unknown | ||
Norway | Liverpool, Lancashire, UK | 6/2/1945 | Philadelphia, PA, USA | 10/18/1945 | ||
Norway | London, UK | 2/2/1945 | Bristol, UK | 2/12/1945 | ||
Norway | Unknown | 1/23/1945 | Unknown | 2/3/1945 | ||
Norway | 1.Styrmann til Skipsfører | Bergen, Norge | 10/25/1939 | Durban, Sør-Afrika | 4/27/1942 | |
Norway | 1. Telegrafist / Sekretær | Newcastle, UK | 1/23/1945 | Philadelphia, PA, USA | 10/18/1945 | |
Norway | 1. Styrmann / Telegrafist | New York, NY, USA | 10/19/1944 | Le Havre, Frankrike | 6/12/1946 | |
Norway | Unknown | 4/9/1953 | Unknown | 8/13/1953 | ||
Norway | Oslo, Norge | 7/1/1939 | Baltimore, MD, USA | 10/18/1944 | ||
Norway | Ommønstring | 2/1/1939 | Hamburg, Tyskland | 7/6/1939 | ||
Norway | 1. Maskinist (Maskinsjef) | London, UK | 7/6/1944 | Le Havre, Frankrike | 3/18/1946 | |
Norway | 1. Maskinist (Maskinsjef) | Durban, Sør-Afrika | 4/7/1943 | Karachi, Pakistan | 7/27/1944 | |
Norway | London, UK | 1/31/1945 | Liverpool, Lancashire, UK | 6/2/1945 |