Seafarer | Nationality | Position | Signed on | Signed off | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Harbour | Date | Harbour | Date | |||
Norway | Grimstad f. utlandet | 5/8/1931 | Arendal, Norge | 7/21/1932 | ||
Norway | Matros / Skytter | Alliert havn | 10/18/1945 | Alliert havn | 1/3/1946 | |
Norway | New York, NY, USA | 10/17/1944 | Alger, Algerie | 3/31/1947 | ||
Great Britain | Skytter | Durban, Sør-Afrika | 4/7/1943 | Aden, Yemen | 2/26/1944 | |
Great Britain | Skytter | Bombay, India | 2/20/1943 | Aden, Yemen | 2/26/1944 | |
Great Britain | Skytter | Bombay, India | 2/20/1943 | Aden, Yemen | 2/26/1944 | |
Great Britain | Skytter | Bombay, India | 2/20/1943 | Aden, Yemen | 2/26/1944 | |
Norway | Port Said, Egypt | 1/11/1940 | Aden, Yemen | 8/31/1941 | ||
Great Britain | Alliert havn | Unknown | Abadan, Iran | 8/15/1942 | ||
Norway | Bombay, India | 10/4/1943 | Abadan, Iran | 12/3/1943 | ||
Norway | Cape Town, Sør-Afrika | 7/1/1943 | Abadan, Iran | 12/3/1943 | ||
Norway | Maskinassistent | Durban, Sør-Afrika | 6/8/1943 | Abadan, Iran | 12/3/1943 | |
Norway | Durban, Sør-Afrika | 6/6/1943 | Abadan, Iran | 10/16/1943 | ||
China | ukjent | Calcutta, India | 1/14/1943 | Abadan, Iran | 3/12/1944 | |
China | ukjent | Calcutta, India | 1/14/1943 | Abadan, Iran | 3/12/1944 | |
China | Kvartermester | Calcutta, India | 1/7/1943 | Abadan, Iran | 3/12/1944 | |
China | Kvartermester | Calcutta, India | 1/7/1943 | Abadan, Iran | 3/12/1944 | |
China | Kvartermester | Calcutta, India | 1/7/1943 | Abadan, Iran | 3/12/1944 | |
Norway | ukjent | Suez, Egypt | 9/8/1942 | Abadan, Iran | 10/3/1942 | |
Norway | Calcutta, India | 3/19/1942 | Abadan, Iran | 10/12/1942 | ||
Norway | Oslo, Norge | 5/16/1939 | Abadan, Iran | 2/14/1942 |