Seafarer | Nationality | Position | Signed on | Signed off | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Harbour | Date 🠗1 | Harbour | Date | |||
Norway | London, UK | 7/2/1954 | London, UK | 6/14/1955 | ||
Norway | Unknown | 12/28/1954 | Unknown | 12/13/1955 | ||
Norway | Ommønstring | 6/15/1955 | London, UK | 12/13/1955 | ||
Norway | Motormann / Donkeymann | Unknown | 6/22/1956 | Unknown | 3/8/1957 | |
Norway | 1. Maskinist (Maskinsjef) | Unknown | 3/1/1957 | Unknown | 7/9/1957 | |
Norway | Tønsberg, Norge | 4/6/1958 | Rotterdam, Holland | 10/27/1958 | ||
Norway | Motormann / Donkeymann | Unknown | 10/18/1958 | Unknown | 2/25/1959 | |
Norway | Stavanger, Norge | 9/16/1962 | London, UK | 4/18/1963 |