Seafarer | Nationality | Position | Signed on | Signed off | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Harbour | Date | Harbour | Date | |||
Norway | 1. Maskinist (Maskinsjef) | Unknown | 6/24/1955 | Unknown | 4/21/1956 | |
Norway | Pumpemann | Unknown | 11/5/1958 | Unknown | 2/2/1959 | |
Norway | Pumpemann | Oslo, Norge | 7/20/1954 | London, UK | 7/11/1955 | |
Norway | Tønsberg, Norge | 6/29/1955 | Antwerpen, Belgia | 6/9/1956 | ||
Norway | Unknown | 12/2/1963 | Unknown | 7/16/1965 | ||
Norway | Maskinassistent | Unknown | 8/27/1956 | Unknown | 6/1/1957 | |
Norway | Maskinassistent | Unknown | 6/5/1956 | Unknown | 8/6/1956 | |
Norway | Grimstad f. utlandet | 2/14/1964 | Rotterdam, Holland | 3/2/1965 | ||
Norway | Oslo f. utlandet | 4/22/1964 | Singapore | 12/13/1964 |