Seafarer | Nationality 🠗1 | Position | Signed on | Signed off | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Harbour | Date | Harbour | Date | |||
Norway | Oslo, Norge | 6/21/1973 | Calais, Frankrike | 8/10/1973 | ||
Norway | 1. Maskinist (Maskinsjef) | Hamburg, Tyskland | 6/1/1971 | Lagos, Nigeria | 10/21/1971 | |
Norway | Unknown | 3/21/1971 | Unknown | 7/31/1971 | ||
Norway | Unknown | 8/21/1969 | Unknown | 11/18/1969 | ||
Norway | Lugarmann | Hamburg, Tyskland | 1/3/1969 | Amsterdam, Nederland | 3/20/1969 | |
Norway | Unknown | 11/23/1962 | Unknown | 6/9/1964 | ||
Norway | Unknown | 5/9/1962 | Unknown | 8/14/1962 |