Skonnert Hvalen
- Shipping company
- Nationality
- Norway
- Home port
- Enlistment district
Shipyard
- Name
- Build year
- 1845
Seafarer | Nationality | Position | Signed on | Signed off |
---|
Harbour | Date | Harbour | Date |
---|
| Norway | | Risør, Norge | 4/26/1866 | Risør, Norge | 10/29/1866 |
| Norway | Sjømann | Risør, Norge | 9/16/1864 | Risør, Norge | 11/8/1864 |
| Norway | | Risør, Norge | 3/31/1864 | Risør, Norge | 11/8/1864 |
| Norway | Sjømann | Risør, Norge | 3/31/1864 | Risør, Norge | 11/8/1864 |
| Norway | Sjømann | Risør, Norge | 4/30/1863 | Risør, Norge | 11/17/1863 |
| Norway | | Risør, Norge | 4/7/1862 | Risør, Norge | 11/17/1863 |
| Norway | Sjømann | Risør, Norge | 4/9/1861 | Risør, Norge | 11/23/1861 |
| Norway | Sjømann av ukjent grad | Risør, Norge | 4/9/1861 | Risør, Norge | 11/23/1861 |
| Norway | Sjømann | Risør, Norge | 3/3/1867 | Omkom | Unknown |
| Norway | Sjømann | Risør, Norge | 4/23/1867 | Forlist | Unknown |
| Norway | Sjømann | Risør, Norge | 4/23/1867 | Forlist | Unknown |
| Norway | ukjent | Risør, Norge | 4/7/1861 | Forlist | Unknown |