Seafarer | Nationality | Position | Signed on | Signed off | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Harbour | Date | Harbour 🠗1 | Date | |||
Norway | 1. Maskinist (Maskinsjef) | Arendal, Norge | 3/1/1943 | Arendal, Norge | 6/25/1946 | |
Norway | Sundsvall, Sverige | 8/31/1945 | Drammen, Norge | 11/10/1945 | ||
Norway | Sundsvall, Sverige | 7/21/1945 | Drammen, Norge | 8/31/1945 | ||
Norway | Bergen, Norge | 4/21/1949 | Mandal, Norge | 4/26/1950 | ||
Norway | Hammerfest, Norge | 3/12/1944 | Oslo, Norge | 9/1/1944 | ||
Norway | Unknown | 10/4/1965 | Unknown | 10/5/1965 | ||
Norway | Unknown | 2/18/1953 | Unknown | 6/18/1953 | ||
Norway | Unknown | 1/31/1952 | Unknown | 5/20/1952 | ||
Norway | ukjent | Unknown | 1/29/1952 | Unknown | 6/1952 | |
Norway | Unknown | 10/22/1951 | Unknown | 12/18/1951 |