Seafarer | Nationality | Position 🠗1 | Signed on | Signed off | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Harbour | Date | Harbour | Date | |||
Norway | Overstyrmann / Vikar | Unknown | Unknown | Unknown | Unknown | |
Norway | Risør, Norge | 6/18/1976 | Sverige | 9/14/1976 | ||
Norway | Bremen, Tyskland | 5/14/1975 | Uddevalla, Sverige | 8/30/1975 | ||
Norway | Bremen, Tyskland | 5/27/1974 | Kragerø, Norge | 8/21/1974 |