Seafarer | Nationality | Position | Signed on | Signed off | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Harbour | Date | Harbour | Date | |||
Norway | 1.Styrmann til Skipsfører | Tvedestrand, Norge | 3/20/1873 | Tvedestrand, Norge | 3/30/1879 | |
Norway | Sjømann | Tvedestrand, Norge | 2/26/1863 | Tvedestrand, Norge | 12/1/1863 | |
Norway | Sjømann | Tvedestrand, Norge | 2/29/1868 | Tvedestrand, Norge | 10/12/1868 | |
Norway | Førstereisgutt | Tvedestrand, Norge | 3/2/1866 | Tvedestrand, Norge | 10/19/1867 | |
Norway | Førstereisgutt | Tvedestrand, Norge | 2/21/1860 | Tvedestrand, Norge | 1/10/1861 | |
Norway | Sjømann | Tvedestrand, Norge | 2/17/1869 | Tvedestrand, Norge | 4/4/1869 |