Seafarer | Nationality | Position | Signed on | Signed off | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Harbour | Date | Harbour 🠗1 | Date | |||
Norway | Offiser | Unknown | 10/21/1952 | Unknown | 10/9/1953 | |
Norway | Unknown | 11/29/1951 | Unknown | 8/10/1951 | ||
Norway | ukjent | Unknown | 3/10/1950 | Unknown | 3/31/1950 | |
Norway | Offiser | Unknown | 11/25/1949 | Unknown | 10/11/1950 | |
Norway | Nestkommanderende | Unknown | 9/30/1948 | Unknown | 2/1/1949 | |
Norway | Nestkommanderende | Unknown | 6/1/1948 | Unknown | 9/30/1948 |