The information on registered seafarers is not in all cases complete. As new sources are studied, information on engagements and medals etc. will be added to some of the already registered seafarers.
Fikk styrnannspatent 12.04.1890 og skipsførercertifikat 11.03.1904.
Fikk reisetiladelse 07.10.1891,19.02.1892,25.01.1894, 26.03.1897 og 15.04.1904.
Mønstret 2.styrmann på "Gloria i New York 29.06.1892,mønstret av i Le Havre 03.11.1893.
Mønstret styrmann på D/S "Leon" i New York 16.09.1898,avmønstring ikke ført.