The information on registered seafarers is not in all cases complete. As new sources are studied, information on engagements and medals etc. will be added to some of the already registered seafarers.
Orlogstjeneste 15.05.1896 til 24.07.1896 Carljohansværn.
Mandskapet er 26.09.1896 optaget i Sømilitære Korps Karljohansværn. Medelt Afskeds fra Sømilitære Korps 28.02.1897.
Fikk styrmannspatent 29.07.1896.
Fikk reisetiladelse 18.04.1905.
Døde på hospital i Leith 04.05.1907.