The information on registered seafarers is not in all cases complete. As new sources are studied, information on engagements and medals etc. will be added to some of the already registered seafarers.
Fikk styrmannspatent 09.09.1885 og skipperpatent 14.08.1893, og nytt 16.07.1904.
Orlogstjeneste 04.05.1885 til 25.08.1885.
Mønstret 2 styrmann på "Elieser" i Tvedestrand 24.09.1885,forliste med denne i Atanteren 25.01.1890.
Mønstret 1.styrmann på D/S "Rodny" i Dremmen 12.01.1912, avmønstring ikke ført.