The information on registered seafarers is not in all cases complete. As new sources are studied, information on engagements and medals etc. will be added to some of the already registered seafarers.
Otto Gunleiksen. Bilde fra Turid Gunleiksen
Fikk ny sjøfartsbok 22.04.1930 og 12.08.1945.
Orlogstjeneste 01.04.1926 til 29.09.1926 og 03.12.1939 til 09.04.1940.
Påmønstret D/S MAUSIKA i Risør 25.06.1931, avmønstret i Tromsø 15.07.1931.